THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:30:03 PM
Song, John Young
CPSO#:
67135
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit A
200 Fitch St
Welland ON L3C 4V9
Phone: (905) 734-9434
Fax: (905) 734-7584
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN YOUNG SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |