THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:37:05 PM
Tarhuni, Wadea Mahmud
CPSO#:
67131
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-2545 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1L9
Phone: 519-250-4449
Fax: 519-250-7807
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:14 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WADEA MAHMUD TARHUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARHUNI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2002 |