THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:21:47 AM
Langille, Heather Isobel
CPSO#:
67114
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Smith, Heather Isobel (used until: 21 Jul 1997 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
171 Slater St
Vanguard Building
Room 1216
AL 3712 M
Ottawa ON K1A 0K9
Phone: 1-855-312-1500 Ext. 0
Fax: 613-990-9397
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER ISOBEL LANGILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGILLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 1996 to 12 Mar 1997
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1995 |