THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:47:00 PM
Stuparyk, Robert Michael
CPSO#:
67073
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hosp
ER
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital |
Sioux Lookout |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake |
Elliot Lake |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: October 24, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On November 4, 2021 Erie Shores Healthcare notified the College pursuant to section 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedure Code that Dr. Robert Michael Stuparyk’s hospital privileges had been suspended effective October 24, 2021 for non-compliance with hospital policy.
Following this, on October 26, 2021, Dr. Stuparyk resigned from Erie Shores Healthcare.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL STUPARYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STUPARYK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1996 |