THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:09:34 AM
Lough, Rodney Darren
CPSO#:
67068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute
Adult Inpatient Psychiatry
F3-357
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-646-6100 Ext. 47592
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Rod Lough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RODNEY DARREN LOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1993 |