THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:41:37 AM
Dziedzic, Malgorzata
CPSO#:
67044
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4037
Fax: (416) 521-4093
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MALGORZATA DZIEDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZIEDZIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1997 |