THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:01:20 AM
Saloojee, Navaaz Ahmed
CPSO#:
67042
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 76420
Fax: (613) 737-8599
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:06 Oct 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVAAZ AHMED SALOOJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALOOJEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1997 to 22 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 22 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 22 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2000 to 22 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2001 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1995 |