THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:23:02 AM
Vieira, Rose-Anne Patricia
CPSO#:
67041
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHO Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 33931
Fax: (905) 7214764
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rose-Anne Vieira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSE-ANNE PATRICIA VIEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIEIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Apr 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 May 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1996 |