THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:14:55 PM
Nemni, Jacqueline Carole
CPSO#:
67040
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
207 Woolwich Street
Guelph ON N1H 3V4
Phone: (519) 341-3344
Fax: (519) 341-4433
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:23 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE CAROLE NEMNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEMNI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respirology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respirology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 05 Sep 1997
Resident 5 - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1993 |