THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:04:59 AM
Di Giacomo, Donato Anthony
CPSO#:
67025
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3080 Yonge Street
3080 yonge street
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
Phone: 4163472061
Fax: 6478468622
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONATO ANTHONY DI GIACOMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI GIACOMO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |