THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:21:58 PM
Mills, Heather Elaine
CPSO#:
67023
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
171 Slater St
Public Service Occupational Health
Health Canada, Government of Canada
12th floor PL 3712 M
Ottawa ON K1P 5H7
Phone: 613 957 6430
Fax: 613 990 9397
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELAINE MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jul 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2003 |