THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:12:48 PM
Middleton, Claire
CPSO#:
67019
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department Anaesthesia, UHN
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5164
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:12 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAIRE MIDDLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDDLETON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 25 May 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1997 |