THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:41:24 PM
Gryfe, Robert Neil
CPSO#:
67006
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto Immune and Digestive Health
Suite 360
North York ON M6A 3B4
Phone: 647 932 8238
Fax: 647 932 8237
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 2, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 2, 2022, Sinai Health notified the College, pursuant to section 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991), that Dr. Robert Neil Gryfe had relinquished his privileges at Sinai Health, effective May 1, 2022.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL GRYFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYFE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2002 |