THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:22:37 PM
Kozyra, Lesia Maria Anna
CPSO#:
66998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Pediatrics
Kids Come First Clinic
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613 737 7600 Ext. 6513
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record may send an e-mail to [email protected] or fax to (613-845-0079).
Date Received: 23 Jan 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESIA MARIA ANNA KOZYRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZYRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1995 |