THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:19:04 PM
Kamble, Vaibhav Arvind
CPSO#:
66985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Marathi
Education: University of Toronto, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VAIBHAV ARVIND KAMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMBLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1993 |