THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:38:33 PM
Buu, Michael My
CPSO#:
66963
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Buu, My (used until: 20 Jun 1995 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: Universite de Hue, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8 Green Lane
units 1-3
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Phone: 905-764-0188
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MY BUU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 1996 |