THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:34:25 PM
Tran, Phuong Pho
CPSO#:
66962
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Dec 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 925
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 597-1616
Fax: (416) 597-2073
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHUONG PHO TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1999 |