THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:08:13 PM
Tuszynska, Hanna Maria
CPSO#:
66934
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish, Spanish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Hospital Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANNA MARIA TUSZYNSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUSZYNSKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Apr 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 1998 |