THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:39:37 PM
Rowhani-Seki, Neda
CPSO#:
66874
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Mar 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Seki, Neda (used until: 13 Feb 2001 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: (705) 325-9402
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Feb 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEDA ROWHANI-SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWHANI-SEKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 07 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Feb 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 2001 |