THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:38:32 PM
Menon, Krishna
CPSO#:
66866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18-3545 Odyssey Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 2S4
Phone: 905 569-7789
Fax: 905 569-7702
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:06 Oct 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISHNA MENON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1997 |