THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:39:37 AM
Shaikh, Shagufta Yasmin
CPSO#:
66850
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Persian, Urdu
Education: Punjab University India, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 406
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 492-9598
Fax: (416) 492-7921
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAGUFTA YASMIN SHAIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAIKH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1995 |