THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:02:40 PM
Farooq, Omar
CPSO#:
66845
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Punjab, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
South Point Walk In Clinic
9368 South Fort Drive
Fort Saskatchewan AB T8L 0C5
Phone: (780) 997-0177
Fax: (780) 669-3979
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Sep 1993
EL - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
McMaster University, 02 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1998 |