THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:24:31 PM
Oandasan, Cheryl Lynn
CPSO#:
66838
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
King Faisal Specialist Hospital and
Research Center, MBC 93
Department of Mental Health
PO Box 3354
Riyadh 11211
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 966114647272 Ext. 36357
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN OANDASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OANDASAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |