THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:40:48 AM
E, Choan Choun
CPSO#:
66813
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
595 Montreal Rd
Suite 305
Ottawa ON K1K 4L2
Phone: 6136808777
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. E. Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHOAN CHOUN E may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. E is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1998 |