THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:50:54 AM
Cogliano, Antonio
CPSO#:
66812
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kugluktuk Health Centre
Community Physician
Box 454
Kugluktuk, NU X0B 0E0
Kugluktuk NU X0B 0E0
Phone: (867) 982-4531
Fax: (867) 982-3115
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTONIO COGLIANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COGLIANO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1995 |