THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:52:02 PM
Seki, John Toshihiko
CPSO#:
66811
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
163 Mary St
Unit 1
Orillia ON L3V 3E3
Phone: 7053256805
Fax: 7053259402
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN TOSHIHIKO SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 14 Aug 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
EL - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 08 Nov 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
EL - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2000 to 30 Apr 2000
EL - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Aug 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2002 |