THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:11:42 PM
Walker, Mark Clarance
CPSO#:
66807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Maternal-Fetal Medicine
PO Box 804
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8551
Fax: 613-737-8070
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK CLARANCE WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1998 |