THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:41:33 PM
McGugan, John Alexander
CPSO#:
66800
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St, Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548 7827
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Aug 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER MCGUGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGUGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 1996 |