THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:20:04 AM
Lougheed, Jane
CPSO#:
66799
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2390
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANE LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Nov 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1997 |