THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:28:55 AM
Leung, Winnie Wing-Chi
CPSO#:
66796
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Ave East
Suite 402
Toronto ON M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 291-1900
Fax: (416) 291-9469
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WINNIE WING-CHI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 1999 |