THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:33:52 AM
Cook, Ashley Garrett
CPSO#:
66793
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
328 Second St West
Cornwall ON K6J 1G9
Phone: (613) 703-1962
Fax: (613) 703-1960
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Sep 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEY GARRETT COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1998 to 04 May 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 05 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 19 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 20 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1999 |