THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:03:50 PM
Marshall, Michelle Theresa
CPSO#:
66769
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Mar 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
505-505 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1B1
Phone: 416 317-7299
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 3 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St. Joseph's Health Centre,
30 The Queensway,
Toronto, Ontario
M6R 1B5
Date Received: 03 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 May 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |