THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:52:58 PM
Edwards, Wendy Elizabeth
CPSO#:
66768
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7160 Grande River Line
Chatham ON N7M 5J7
Phone: 5193800029
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WENDY ELIZABETH EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1997 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)