THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:56:41 AM
Want, David Andrew
CPSO#:
66764
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Andrew Want Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2022
Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2015
Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:13 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |