THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:52:52 AM
Jones, Graham Longden
CPSO#:
66755
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Dec 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3U7 M U M C
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 76401
Fax: 905 521 4971
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:26 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRAHAM LONGDEN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jul 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1997 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 1999 |