THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:46:14 PM
Johnston, Ian Geoffrey
CPSO#:
66754
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A-150 Richmond St
Chatham ON N7M 1N9
Phone: (519) 397-5455
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN GEOFFREY JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1997 |