THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:56:28 AM
Akyurekli, Deniz
CPSO#:
66730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Turkish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 1S4
Phone: (519) 371-5769
Fax: (519) 371-8708
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Deniz Akyurekli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seen up until May 29, 2015, may contact:
Dr. Deniz Akyurekli
Centre for Personal Enhancement
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound, ON N4K 1S4
Telephone: 519-371-5769
Date Received: 19 May 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DENIZ AKYUREKLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKYUREKLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1998 |