THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:25:49 AM
Chien, Vincent
CPSO#:
66715
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of General Internal Medici
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165865133
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VINCENT CHIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 06 Oct 1997
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1997 |