THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:43:26 PM
Newbery, Sarah-Lynn
CPSO#:
66686
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH-LYNN NEWBERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWBERY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1995 to 28 Feb 1996
CF - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1996 to 31 May 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1995 |