THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:51:27 PM
Morgan, Jane Ann
CPSO#:
66685
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
202A-1685 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1G5
Phone: 9057452237
Fax: none
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANE ANN MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1999 |