THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:34:53 PM
White, Stephen Francis
CPSO#:
66680
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Napanee - L & A Hospital
8 Park Drive
Napanee ON K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN FRANCIS WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1995 |