THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:33:17 AM
Neidert, Eric John
CPSO#:
66658
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department Of Critical Care
Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2651
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:25 May 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC JOHN NEIDERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEIDERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1999 |