THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:44:18 PM
Leung, Kent Kwan-Kin
CPSO#:
66650
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kent Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, Ontario
M9L 0A3
Canada
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1995 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 Nov 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |