THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:13:50 PM
MacDougall, Peter Charles
CPSO#:
66636
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter MacDougall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 1995 to 14 Nov 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 25 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2019 |