THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 7:17:46 AM
Kelford, Alison Maureen
CPSO#:
66634
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Kelford Smith, Alison Maureen (used until: 05 Feb 1996 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Mindfulness Studies
180 Sudbury St, Unit c2
Toronto
Oakville ON L6H 0M2
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record from Dr. Kelford’s family practice should contact Dr. L Leung at: Telephone: 905-845-8771 Mailing: 202-209 Oak Park Blvd Oakville L6H 0M2
Date Received: 20 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALISON MAUREEN KELFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2024 |