THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:50:49 PM
Houpt, Daniel Robin
CPSO#:
66633
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Morton Community Health Centre
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 652-3318
Fax: (705) 6523945
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Houpt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBIN HOUPT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOUPT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2002 |