THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:30:51 PM
Ohayon, Jason Abraham
CPSO#:
66601
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-1685 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 1G5
Phone: (905) 777-0088
Fax: (905) 777-0018
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Ohayon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2007
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:02 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON ABRAHAM OHAYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHAYON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1997 |