THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:24:48 PM
Chakraborty, Pranesh Kumar
CPSO#:
66599
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Newborn Screening Ontario
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3427
Fax: (613) 738-0853
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Biochemistry |
Effective:18 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRANESH KUMAR CHAKRABORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABORTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Medical Biochemistry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Medical Biochemistry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2001 |