THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:32:33 AM
Califaretti, Nadia Federica Bruna
CPSO#:
66584
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer
Centre
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5262
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADIA FEDERICA BRUNA CALIFARETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALIFARETTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1997 |