THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:34:35 PM
Di Primio, Luigia Anna
CPSO#:
66572
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Halton Healthcare Service - OTMH
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, ON
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUIGIA ANNA DI PRIMIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI PRIMIO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1999 |